Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yubeta, Natalie, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Rodriguez, Kalynn, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court 1 DAY Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents CH600- THERE IS NO RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING IN THIS CASE - PLEASE CONTACT THE SELF HELP DEPARMENT WITH QUESTIONS AT 530-406-6793 |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing EXP 02/25/2024 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents CH-600 - THIS FORM IS ONLY TO TERMINATE A RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING. YOUR CASE HAS A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, NOT A RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK FOR REVIEW OF CH116 |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Disqualification 170.6 DISQ - JUDGE MCADAM |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge AGAINST JUDGE MCADAM, FILED BY RESP |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted DISQUALIFY JUDGE MCADAM PER CCP170.6 BY RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.