Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Romanyuk, Alex, Romanyuk, Svetlana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Phan, Larry Q, Vo, Chinh T, against Johnson, Brooklyn Jane, represented by Hirsig, Peter J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion to Strike
Date: January 05, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2021*Motion
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff for Failure to Appear and Failure to file an CMC Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | *Tentative Decisions Posted | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case/Cause Taken Under Submission Decided | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | *Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL APPEARING PARTIES INCLUDING COURT REPORTER. |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF DANIEL R MAYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS REPLY TO PALAINTIFF Y ROMANYUKS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF YURI ROMANYUKS DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF DANIEL R MAYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFF Y ROMANYUKS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF YURI ROMANYUK TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SET ONE |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Lodging of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.