Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ample Electric, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Codog, Benjamin J, against Hotel Winters, Llc, Hotel Winters Restaurant Event Center, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case/Cause Taken Under Submission Decided CT JUDGMENT ENTERED |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Pre-Disposition Hearing PROVE UP Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | *Case/Cause Under Submission for Decision | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing PROVE UP |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK FOR REVIEW OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Re Request for Default Judgment by Clerk and Supporting Papers | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents JUDGMENT PACKET - THE COURT CANNOT CONFIRM PROCESS SERVER'S FEES. BOTH PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FILE DO NOT LIST THE FEES FOR SERVICE. ALSO, PLEASE PROVIDE PROOF OF FEES FOR THE YOLO COUNTY RECORDING IF YOU WANT THIS ADDED TO YOUR COSTS. THANK YOU. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.