Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 1991 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseCivil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 1996 | Action | ||
September 12, 1995 | Action | ||
April 23, 1991 | Hearing | Other Hearing | |
April 23, 1991 | Hearing | Other Hearing | |
April 17, 1991 | Hearing | Other Hearing | |
March 06, 1991 | Hearing | Other Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.