Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

CARLSON VS SEVERN

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months, 1 week

Case Overview

On August 6, 1997 A Civil case was filed by Carlson, Renee, against Severn, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

August 6, 1997

Last Refreshed

Feb 27, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

DV-100 Request for Order, Domestic Violence Prevention

Parties

Respondent

Petitioner

See all parties

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 707 date: 03/04/2008 time: 09:00 AM
Order to Show Cause re Modification

judge: Carrie Panetta

Docket Event Confidential Mediation Report
Docket Event Hearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 707 date: 03/04/2008 time: 09:00 AM
Docket Event Referred to Child Custody Mediation
Docket Event OSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued
Docket Event Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 12/04/2007 09:00 AM D- 707
Docket Event Application Re: Application and Order for Reissuance of Order to Show Cause Filed
Docket Event Temporary Orders and/or OST Denied
Docket Event OSC - Family Law 10/30/2007 09:00 AM D- 707
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.