Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Prince, Stephan Thaddeus, Stephan Thaddeus Prince, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Rivas, Caria Castro, Esq., against Malhi, Manny, Malhi, Surjit, Malhi, Tao, Manny Malhi, R Millennium Transport Inc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Ca-Stanislaus County with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseCa-Stanislaus County |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 14, 2021Complaint
Date: July 14, 2021Complaint
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | CV-21-003654 – PRINCE, STEHAN THADDEUS VS MALHI, SURJIT – Plaintiff’s Motion for Monetary, Issue, and/or Terminating Sanctions – HEARING REQUIRED. Based on the information submitted by the moving part... | |
October 03, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
March 14, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
November 15, 2021 | Case Management Conference | ||
October 29, 2021 | Case Management Conference Statement | ||
October 22, 2021 | Notice | ||
August 16, 2021 | Answer | ||
August 10, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | ||
August 10, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | ||
August 10, 2021 | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.