Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Harding, Jenifer, filed a(n) Other Complaint: Unlimited case represented by Faulk, Kevin, Esq., against Central Valley Motors Inc, represented by Wollman, Russell S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Complaint: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by Jenifer Harding against Central Valley Motors, Inc. and Does One through Twenty in the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. The complaint alleges violations of California Civil Code § 1750 et seq. and Califor...
Declaration
Date: March 25, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: April 15, 2021Summons on Amended Complaint
Date: April 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FIRST Amended Complaint |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons on Amended Complaint FIRST Summons on Amended Complaint |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration FOR COMPLAINT UNDER CLRA Declaration |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.