Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Catano, Blanca, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sloves, Max N, Esq., against Avitek Recruit Inc, Compass Foods Inc, Human Bees Inc, represented by Fox, Kathryn B, Esq., Woo, Peter P., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.