Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Building Industry Association Of The Greater Valley, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Jolley, Bretts, Esq., against City Of Hughson, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Judicial Review: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order
Date: March 03, 2021Complaint
Date: February 22, 2021Ex Parte Appointment Hearing
Date: March 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Reviewed by Court | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON EX PARTE APPLICATION Order |
|
March 03, 2021 | Hearing | Ex Parte Appointment Hearing | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Ex Parte Hearing Exparte Appointment Hearing Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Ex Parte Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.