Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jody Hernandezmoore, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Fernandez, Isandra, Esq., against Sutter Outpatient Services Llc, represented by Zanassi, Kacie L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer
Date: April 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Case Designation - Plaintiffs | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.