Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cummings, Doug filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2020 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR SENT TO JUDGE MCADAM |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Received FROM MARK A. MURO, ESQ. |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing F&O AFTER HEARING |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition TO APPOINT NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Received DOCUMENTS FROM DEFT KARL CUMMINGS |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE; SERVED KARI DOUGLAS CUMMINS WITH APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DESIGNATION OF NOMINEES, MEMO OF POINTS, AND ORIGINAL, AMENDED, AND SECOND AMENDED NOTICE ON HEARING OF PETITION FOR ORDER APPOINTING NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR ON 8/20/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.