Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martin, Frank, Martin, Snezhanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Strouss, John P, Iii, against Powell, Jonathan Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
*Case Management Conference
Date: November 02, 2020*Case Management Conference
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition RE DISM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference /DISM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing OSC RE SANCTIONS/DISM & CMC MIN ORD TO PLTF |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE SANCTIONS/DISM |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFFS WITHOUT POS |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MCADAM |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY UNLIMITED CIVIL COMP Notes: UNLIMITED CIVIL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.