Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cruz, Danny Gilbert, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Swartz, Mark R, against Colobara'S Cabinet & Millwork, Inc., represented by Alberto, Janell M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY COLOMBARA'S CABINET & MILLWORKS, INC |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF THE FILING OF A COMPLAINT AGAINST A THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853 |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLTFF |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Posted - $150.00 | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.