Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Flores Cruz, Ulisses, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Eison, Owili K, against Gin, Mylinh Fu, Gin Philip & Mylinh Trust, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 01, 2020 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Order to Show Cause
Date: October 06, 2020*Motion
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING ATTY'S MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - BY ATTY J. SONNEGA |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Tentative Decisions Posted FORMAL ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELEIVED AS COUNSEL | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - $60 Fee TO BE RELEIVED AS COUNSEL |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.