Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ramos Oil Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Montague, Vanessa, against All Valley Tow & Transport, Inc., Hard, James Frank, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management389 days |
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions134 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: January 25, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: January 29, 2021*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: February 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case Debtor Examination Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte RE: missed debtors exam/civil bench warrant Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ex Parte Motion to Set Aside Order re Bench Warrant filed by Plaintiff |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION TO SET ASIDE RULING REGARDING BENCH WARRANT & RECALL BENCH WARRANT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES HARD |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion Petitioner |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY JAMES FRANK HARD - WITHOUT PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service served James Frank Hard w/ Order to Appear for Examination on 1/13/21 |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.