Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cooksey, Keira, Cooksey, Randall Eric, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Phoong, Anh, against Knape, Judith, represented by Zelezen, Samantha J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 01, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 5 DAYS Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Fees Posted Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CV/FL/PB Notes: FILED BY JUDITH KNAPE |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) ADVANCED JURY FEES Notes: ADVANCED JURY FEES PAID BY JUDITH KNAPE |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JUDITH KNAPE WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT PACKET ON 6/18/2020 |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE WOLK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.