Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
D-Q University Board Of Trustees, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Duran, Jack, against Axelrod, Sonya, Cardoza, Holly, Eppard, John, Fernandez, Joshua, Gonzalez, Robert, (total of 11) See All represented by Greiner, James R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
Category26: Limited Other Real Property - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: June 28, 2022 Department Nine 10:30 a.m. The Court notes, regarding defendants Michael Williams and Sky Webb’s he... | |
June 01, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: June 1, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. Defendant Michael Williams’s request for judicial notice is DENIED. (Evid.... | |
May 26, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: May 26, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. On the Court’s own motion, defendant Michael A. Williams’ motion to dismis... | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 21, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: April 21, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. Parties are DIRECTED TO APPEAR. | |
April 07, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: April 7, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED TO APPEAR. | |
March 30, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: March 30, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. Before the Court is plaintiff D-Q University Board of Trustee’s unoppose... | |
March 17, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case: D-Q University Board of Trustees v. Williams Case No. CV-2019-1703 Hearing Date: March 17, 2022 Department Nine 9:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED TO APPEAR. | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Remittitur
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents NOTICE OF APPEAL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.