Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen, Charles R., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jensen, Charles R., against Baker, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management389 days |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2013 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions687 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time687 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: COST $420.00; CREDITS $ 2,500.00; INTEREST $7,545.51 |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO $23,717.91 |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ORD DETERM CLM EXMPT |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM EXMP DENIED Notes: FUNDS ORDERED RELEASED TO CREDITOR |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAINSHELF, MO (11/1/18) W/ OUTCARD |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL LAW AND MOTION MINUTE ORDER *Opposition to Claim of Exemption OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A Notes: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption NTC OPPOSE CLM EXEMP Notes: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC HRG CLM OF EXMPT Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption NTC OPPOSE CLM EXEMP Notes: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.