Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Douglas A Galbreat, H Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cunningham, Phillip M, against Metamorphix, Inc., Mmi Genomics Inc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management387 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2009 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions58 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO MMI GENOMICS, INC. | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF PHILLIP M CUNNINGHAM OF AMOUNT OF INT ACCRUED ON JUDMNENT |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY AS TO 26384.42 |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion ATTORNEYS PHILLIP CUNNINGHAM FOR PLAINTIFF; MARLENE BOGUE FOR DEFENDANT. NO OPPOSITION TO TR, WHICH IS ADOPTED BY THE COURT. DEBTOR, ERIC JOHNSON, PREV SWORN, IS EXAMINED BY COUNSEL OUTSIDE THE COURTROOM. Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ruling TENTATIVE RUL ADPTD |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | TENTATIVE RULING PST Notes: TENTATIVE RULING POSTED | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ATTY UNIT |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF JOYCE ELLIOT IN SUPP OF DEFTS MTN TO VAC DEFAULT JDMNT |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF JACKIE RITCHIE IN SUPP OF DEFTS MTN TO VAC DEFAULT JDMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.