Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Oil Co., Inc, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Montague, John D, against Ameri Oil Company,, Inc., Amiri, Azad, Brentwood American, Station, Kang Property, Inc, ., Kang, Sarbjit S, (total of 6) See All represented by Kravitz, Jeffrey S., Mcfarlane, Dustin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2008 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial588 days |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions365 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Post-Disposition Hearing
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing PROVE - UP |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Proof of Service SERVED BY MAIL W/ MEMO OF COSTS ON 2/17/2021 | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs $422,911.15 COSTS, $74,073.76 CREDITS, $335,167.50 INTEREST |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT: BOXES LEFT UNCHECKED UNDER ATTORNEY'S INFORMATION; CREDITS LISTED DO NOT MATCH MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED 02/01/21; VIA E-FILE |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs $335,167.50 INTEREST |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT - A MEMORANDUM OF COSTS MUST BE SUBMITTED IN ORDER TO ADD INTEREST AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.