Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trisch, Tory L, Trisch, Harold G, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Virga, John E., against Temple, Charles E., Iii, represented by Labarge, Wendy C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management291 days |
Filing DateJune 23, 2005 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial649 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time687 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order EX PARTE MIN ORDER Notes: CASE DISMISSED |
|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) UNCONDITIONAL |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: GAIL/FILE AWAY |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION IN LIEU OF MANDATORY SETTLE MENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID M BLICKER CLERK NOT PRESENT CONTINUED TO/FOR: 3-19-07 SC @1330PM D-4 CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE PARTIES Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DAVID BLICKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.