Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Direct Merchants C, Redit Card B Ank,N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Shade, Ross S, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management269 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2003 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions710 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time784 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY Action: VAC |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued ABST/WRIT ISSUED* Notes: ABSTRACT ISSUED |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION-FILED | |
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing CLAIM OF EXEMPTION WITH/BY ATTORNEY: LELAND L MOGLEN DEFENDANT SWORN AND TESTIFIED CLAIM OF EXEMPT GRANTED $$ RELEASE TO DEBTOR Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption CLM EXMP GRANTED Notes: FUNDS ORDERED RETURNED TO DEBTOR |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ATTY UNIT |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESPONSE TO PLEADING - DEFENDANT ROSS SHADE |
|
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST* Notes: REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.