Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lalo, Crystal A, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Maltezo, Elisio, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review PETITIONER PRESENT W/MOTHER; MENTAL HEALTH: LINDA NOWELL; DA: KING; ELISIO MALTEZO W/ILOCANO INTERPRETER; PD JOHNSON. CRIM CASES DISMISSED UNDER 1370. DEF ADMONISHED TO BE A GOOD NEIGHBOR AND NOT HARASS PETITIONER Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF/MINOR PRESENT W/ PD & ILOCANO INTERP CONTINUED FOR REV 7/11/06 8:30 DEPT 11 Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF/MINOR PRESENT CONTINUED FOR REV 3/29/06 1:30 DEPT 8 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REIVEW MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES PLT APP WAIVED DEF APPEARS W/PD A. WALKER & INTERP MENTAL HEALTH REP LINDA HOWELL PRESENT COURT ACK MENTAL HEALTH QUART REV REPORT, DEF IS STILL INCOMPETENT TO STAND TRIAL (REPORT PLACED IN CONFIDENTIAL ENVLOPE) MATTER CONTINUED FOR REVIEW TO 01-18-06 1:30 P.M. IN DEPT 11 ; PD WILL SEND NOTICE TO PLT FOR UP DATE. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, APP WAIVED DEF APPEARS W/PD A. WALKER COU ADV COURT PLT IS STILL SEEING MENTAL HEALTH AND IS NOW ON MEDICATION; EXHISITING ORDER REMAINS IN PLACE; PD WILL CONTACT PLT AND ADVISE; MATTER CONTINUED TO 10-5-05 1:30PM REVIEW DEPT 11; PLT APP WAIVED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review COPY OF AGREEMENT TO BE PROVIDED TO CT THIS CASE TRAILILNG CRMINAL CASE PARTIES TO APPEAR ON 7/13/05 WITH INTERPRETER AFTER CRMINAL MATTER DETERMINED COUNSEL TO DO OAH TO REFLECT MR MALTEZO IN TREATMENT & HAS SIGNED AGREEMENT Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW PLAINTIFF PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT, PD A. WALKER APPEARS L. HOWELL FROM MENTAL HEALTH PRESENT PD ATTEMPTED TO CONTACT DEF AT WORK TO COME IN AND BE INTERVIEWED BY MENTAL HEALTH THIS MORNING, NOT SUCCESSFUL; COURT CONTINUED TRO IN ITS CURRENT STATUSCONTINUED MATTER TO 4-14-05 8:30AM FOR STATUS REV IN DEPT 11; PLAINTIFF'S APPEARANCE WAIVED NEXT HEARING, PD WILL CONTACT PLT AND ADVISE THEM OF PROGRESS. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW MENTAL HEALTH APPOINTMENT DEF APPEARS W/PD A. WALKER COUNSEL ADVISES COURT DEF IS AWAITING TO DO TELEPHONIC INTERVIEW BY USE OF INTERP & MENTAL HEALTH. PD ADV COURT THERE IS A 166 CRIM CASE NOW PENDING AGAINST DEFENDANT WHICH IS SCHEDULED FOR 3-28-05. COURT CONTINUED THIS MATTER TO 3-28-05 8:30AM FOR OSCTRO IN DEPT 11, INTERP TO COME TO DEPT 11 W/DEF THAT MORNING AFTER CRIM CASE. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Interpreter Required During Hearing INTERPRETER REQUIRED |
|
March 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW PROGRAMS DEF APPEARS W/PD A. WALKER COUNSEL ADV COURT DEF WENT TO MR. BRYANT'S OFFICE WAS UNABLE TO MAKE AN APPOINTMENT, COUNSEL ADV COURT SHE WOULD ASSIST HIM IN MAKING AN APPOINTMETN, REQ COURT CONTINUE MATTER TODAY. CONTINUED TO/FOR: 3-11-05 8:30AM REV PROG DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.