Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liberty Mutual Ins, Urance Compa Ny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tenenbaum, Jay M, against Morris, Donte K., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management265 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2003 |
Category22: Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED IN THE AMT OF $8645.00 |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: SOLANO COUNTY FOR $8067.18 |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $329.16 INTEREST |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLT NOT PRESENT DEF PRESENT COURT FINDS NO SERVICE, DEF STATES HIS ATTY SERVED PAPERS, COURT INQUIRES WHO IS DEF'S ATTY, DEF STATES AL; MOTION TO SETASIDE DEFAULT DENIED BY COURT TODAY COURT REFERRED DEF BACK TO HIS ATTY. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter NSF LTR SENT-CIVIL Notes: check #1092 for $183.30 returned by bank marked NSF 183.30 +25.00= $208.30 due by 11/11/05 Action: REV |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ANSWER |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts Issued CERT FACTS ISS DL30 Notes: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT- DL30 ALONG WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT |
|
September 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
June 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.