Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gorham, Christopher, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Sturges, Hubert F. Md, Boswell, Brian C. Md, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management248 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2003 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1923 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER SIGNED & FILED | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN TO DISMISS FOR FTP CASE ORDERED DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION ORDER SIGNED & FILED Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTRY OF ORD Notes: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BRIAN C. BOSWELL, MD'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORD GRANTING* Notes: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BRIAN C. BOSWELL, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.