Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fonss, Heidi, Fonss, John Gerald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martinez & Kaminski, against Khana, Nagan, Patel, Jasoo J, Khana, Parsilal, represented by Powers, J. Brian, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management245 days |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2003 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial549 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time532 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury PER PARTIES FAX. CASE HAS SETTLED. HARD COPY TO FOLLOW Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement NTC OF SETTLEMENT Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6(A)(2) - unCONDITIONAL |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event | CLAIM FORM TO FISCAL Notes: CLAIM TO FISCAL FOR PAYMENT TO MARTINEZ & KAMINSKI FOR REFUND OF JURY FEES | |
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
TbyD - Trust Balance to be Refunded REFUND JURY DEPOSIT Notes: REFUND JURY DEPOSIT TO MARTINEZ & KAMINSKI |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
TbyD - Trust Balance to be Refunded REFUND JURY DEPOSIT Notes: REFUND JURY DEPOSIT TO POWERS & MILLER |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event | CLAIM FORM TO FISCAL Notes: CLAIM TO FISCAL FOR PAYMENT TO POWERS & MILLER FOR REFUND OF JURY FEES | |
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.