Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hygieia Biological, Wallis, Dale M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mendoza, Joanna R, against Phl Associates, In, C., represented by Downey Brand, Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Thomas E. Warriner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas E. Warriner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2002 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bail Reversal BAIL REVSL -GENERAL Notes: BAIL REVERSAL |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Remittitur Filed REMITTITUR Notes: REMITTITUR - ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS IS REVERSED. CASE REMANDED BACK TO TRIAL COURT FOR ACTION ON REMITTITUR |
|
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury JURY TRIAL Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION* | |
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION* Notes: OF X-COMPLTS JEFFREY WICHMANN & MARY HOLMES TO OBJECT IONS OF WALLIS DEFENDANTS AND JOANNA R. MENDOZA TO RE FEREE REPORT NO. 12 ORDERING SANCTIONS FILED BY X-COMPLTS JEFFREY WICHMANN & MARY HOLMES | |
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes WORKLOAD ONLY -JBSIS |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
General Close CLOSE CASE |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
General Close CLOSE CASE Notes: CASE CLOSED - NO MORE ENTRIES ALLOWED SEE CVCV06-7235 APPT OF COUNSEL |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A Notes: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF JOANNA R MENDOZA IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.