Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ridinger, Chris D filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against West Sacramento El, Ks Lodge, Mullins, John, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2001 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2232 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2232 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment ORD OSC-DISM FST TRK Notes: FILED |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MTN DISM LACK PROSEC NO APPEARANCE MOTION GRANTED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter LTR RETURNED Notes: LETTER RETURNED TO COURT UNDELIVERED - CHRIS D. RIDIN GER |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
November 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
November 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte filed EX PRT HRG SET Notes: AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF, RIDINGER. |
|
February 05, 2001 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: FILED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE,ETC-DENIED | |
January 09, 2001 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF PENDING ACTION; PLAINTIFF | |
January 09, 2001 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - SUPER Notes: FOR DECLATORY RELIEF; INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ACCOUNTING. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.