Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dsd Properties, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Selby, Donald, Openclaw, Jenny, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2000 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1982 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: SIGNED AND FIL | |
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED | |
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APP Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Letter LTR RETURNED Notes: LETTER RETURNED TO COURT UNDELIVERED - DSD PROPERTIES - VACANT; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Letter LTR RETURNED Notes: LETTER RETURNED TO COURT UNDELIVERED - DSD PROPERTIES - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
April 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.