Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Motley, Joseph O, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mullen, Jacob James, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Notice Upon Ex Parte Application for Order | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.