Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joseph O Motley, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Hearing | Motion for Attorney's Fees/Costs | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Motion for Attorney's Fees/Costs Motion for Attorney's Fees/Costs Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion & Motion | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Relinquishment of Firearms
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.