Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Godwin, Ann Marie, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Fletcher, Gregory, Morris, Donald J, Redwood Developmen, T, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 1998 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR PRESENT GEORGE SOMMERS DEBTOR PRESENT DONALD MORRIS DEBTOR SWORN AND RELEASED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued SUB DUCES TECUM ISS Notes: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, CREDCO FIRST AMERICAN, 12395 FIRST AMERICAN WAY, POWAY, CA 92064 |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: GAIL/FILE AWAY |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued SUB DUCES TECUM ISS Notes: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS, VALLEJO CHRYSLER PLYMOUTH DODGE, 4325 SONOMA BLVD., VALLEJO, CA 94589 |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR DONALD J MORR IS GEORGE SOMMERS PRESENT NO POS CONTINUED TO/FOR: 5-10-07 0900AM D-2 OX Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued SUB DUCES TECUM ISS Notes: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED DONALD J MORRIS |
|
February 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: DONALD J MORRIS |
|
October 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.