Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jamie, Refugio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hurtado, Rafael, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 1998 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED | |
May 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-V-98000563(V1) | |
September 14, 1998 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.