Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Soto, Maria, Soto, Antonio, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wirth, Douglas D., against Soares, Diana Lynn, Soares, Robin L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 1998 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISM LACK PROSECUTION NO APP, MTN GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED & FILED. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: DISM ORDER | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
February 17, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORD GRANTING* Notes: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD |
|
February 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD-GRANTED. (tb) Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Motion MOTION $ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.