Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northern Californi, A Collection Service, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Kanefsky, Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 1998 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment ACK SATISFY JDGM Notes: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR PLTFF NP DEF NP CASE DROPPED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: COURT |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: MAILED IN SASE | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: APP AND ORDER FOR APPRNC AND EXAM - ENFORCEMENT OF JDGMT/JDGMT DEBTOR |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) RENEWAL OF JDGM* |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) APP RENEWAL/JUD Notes: APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | ISSUED* Notes: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
January 31, 2000 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF. LC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.