Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wyrsch, Leo David, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Byers, David W, against Johnson, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Timothy L. Fall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy L. Fall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 1997 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT MAILED: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT, TO ANGELA JOHNSON ON 12/ 05/07 | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: $109.00 COSTS; $79.14 CREDIT; $1,516.07 INTEREST |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) APP RENEWAL/JUD Notes: APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | ISSUED* Notes: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing CLAIM OF EXEMPTION NO APPEARANCE COURT ORDERS CREDITOR TO COLLECT $55.00 PER PAY PERIO D. Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC HRG CLM OF EXMPT Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes WORKLOAD ONLY -JBSIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.