Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John Taylor Fertil, Izers Co, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Ward, Dan, Ward, Jim, Ward, John, Ward, Juanita, Ward, Robin, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 1995 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-V-95000704(V4) | |
May 13, 1996 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT. | |
April 12, 1996 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
April 05, 1996 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF MARK A. CAMPBELL IN OPPOS... ...ITION TO MOTION TO S TRIKE ANSWER AND ENTER DEFAULT |
|
April 05, 1996 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A |
|
March 29, 1996 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes PSI-EVENT NOT MAPPED |
|
March 28, 1996 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DILIGENCE STATEMENT |
|
March 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: AND MOTION TO STRIKE |
|
March 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities MEMO OF P & A |
|
March 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF DAVID A. RIEGELS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.