Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Granite Constructi, On, Hal C. Aguirre Co,, Inc, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Aguirre, Hal C, Hal C. Aguirre Co,, Inc, Hermsmeyer Paving, Hermsmeyer, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 1995 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Dismissal NTC OF ENTR DISM/POM |
|
June 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF. LC |
|
June 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: NEW ADDRESS FOR WILLIAM T. MCNULTY JR.: 22696 MAIN STREET HAYWARD, CA 94541-512 |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-V-95000037(V4) | |
March 25, 1996 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
March 11, 1996 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
February 28, 1996 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes PSI-EVENT NOT MAPPED Notes: P ATTNY: ELMER R MALAKOFF D ATTNY: HAL C AGUIRRE |
|
February 27, 1996 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement SETTLMNT CONF STMT |
|
February 23, 1996 | Docket Event |
Filed CERTIFICATION* Notes: RE: FAX FILING |
|
February 23, 1996 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement SETTLMNT CONF STMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.