Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chamberlain Farms, Chamberlain, Duane, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jensen, Charles R., against Roberts, Don, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 1990 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISM LACK PROSECUTION NO APP, MOTION GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED & FILED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: DISMISSAL ORDER | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to CHARLES R. JENSEN returned - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
March 30, 1990 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 30, 1990 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.