Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo Federal Credi, T Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Honkanen, Marcella J, Honkanen, Ted E, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 1989 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES MTN TO DISM LACK OF PROSECUTION ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
June 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to ROBERT S. BARTLETT returned - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
October 30, 1989 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.