Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tcc Properties, In, C, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Roth, Harry David, against Brick, James, Holcombe, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 1988 |
Category35: Limited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: DISMISSAL ORDER | |
April 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISM LACK PROSECUTION NO APPEARANCE, MOTION GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED & FILED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to HARRY D. ROTH returned - ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
December 22, 1988 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.