Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford, William C, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Sartin, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 1988 |
Category35: Limited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
March 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES COURT SIGNED ORDER IN OPEN COURT FOR DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to WILLIAM C. FORD returned - RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
July 25, 1988 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.