Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo County Collec, Tions, Zurcher, Gary Walter, Jessee, Virginia Mae, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lauricella, John E, against Thiers, Kathy, Boles, Kathy, Boles, Chris Ala, Boles, Christopher Alan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 1988 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: DISMISSAL ORDER | |
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISM LACK PROSECUTION NO APP, MOTION GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED & FILED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
March 02, 1988 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.