Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Esse, Grace, Esq., Winn Law Group, Apc, against Brittney Milam, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request
Date: October 02, 2020Civil Complaint
Date: December 31, 2019Judgment by Default by Court
Date: August 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Reopened - Civil | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL Order |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL Request |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.