Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Miller, Genaya Leeann, Parra, Bianna Nicole, Segoviano, Jasmine Mariah, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Or Prohibition: Unlimited case represented by Chase, Robert D, Esq., Hillenbrand, John J, Esq., against Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpeiller, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Or Prohibition: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: June 03, 2020Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition
Date: July 28, 2020Answer/General Denial
Date: April 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action WITHOUT PREJUDICE Request for Dismissal - Entire Action |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action WITHOUT PREJUDICE Request for Dismissal - Party Only |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/General Denial TO AMENDED PETITION Answer/General Denial |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Motion for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.