Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burrows, Jason M, Esq., against Crayton, Phallenna, represented by Young, Dustin A., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Time To Trial375 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Conditional
Date: December 30, 2020Complaint
Date: December 30, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Conditional
Date: June 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Waiver Court Trial Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Conditional | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Conditional | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer/General Denial | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Filed Summons Issued / Filed |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Waiver | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.