Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group, Llp, against Corey Rogers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Sandhu, Sonny S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandhu, Sonny S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $10,000 - $25,000 |
Time To Trial376 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions214 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time741 days |
Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: July 30, 2019Declaration of Accrued Interest on Money Judgment
Date: July 30, 2019Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: January 08, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 09, 2020Court Trial
Date: January 08, 2020Request for Dismissal - Not Entered
Date: August 24, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 07, 2021Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 07, 2021Request for Court Judgment
Date: August 24, 2020Declaration of Accrued Interest on Money Judgment
Date: August 24, 2020Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 09, 2020Civil Complaint
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Telephonic Appearance Notice |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Reviewed by Court | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Not Entered | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Accrued Interest on Money Judgment | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default Judgment CCP 1788 Declaration for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.