Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, Esq., Thomas, Vanessa, Esq., against Ishtar Saiyady, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Time To Trial378 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Ishtar Saiyady and Does 1 to 10. The case is a limited civil case and the amount demanded is not specified. The complaint alleges causes of action for breach of contract and co...
Civil Complaint
Date: December 28, 2018Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 13, 2020Declaration
Date: January 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
November 13, 2020 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER-Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court Trial Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Court Trial Court Trial Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Declaration |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s) | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Waiver | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.