Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Davidson-Evans, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Montee, Kevin P., against Does 1-25, Garcia, Jorge Albero, Garcia, Jose Alberto, represented by Ramos, Julio, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charles F. Haines presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Haines Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200040131) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, JOSE ALBERTO
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200040131) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARCIA, JOSE ALBERTO | |
September 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for September 13, 2021 line 13. DEFENDANT JOSE GARCIA'S AMENDED DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT is OVERRULED. Complaint alleges a termination of t... | |
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Amended DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-13-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANT JOSE GARCIA'S AMENDED DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS OVERRULED. SEE MINUTES FOR COMPLETE RULING. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312(B). JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: KENNETH B. HUNT; NOT REPORTED. (D501) | |
September 10, 2021 | Hearing |
DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
September 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Amended DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
September 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for September 8, 2021 line 11. DEFENDANT JOSE GARCIA Amended DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT is continued to September 13, 2021. Plaintiff is ordered ... | |
September 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Amended DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.