Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
351 Turk Street Partnership, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Uziel, Jaime C, against De Leon, Jeremy 351 Turk Street #, Does 1 To 20, Inclusive 351 Turk Street #, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 17, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $35.83 PER DAY (DAILY RENTAL VALUE) FILED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 351 TURK STREET, #1013, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94102, LEASE FORFEITED, **APPLIES TO ALL UNNAMED/UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.** | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JULIAN T. LASTOWSKI RE: LOST ORIGINAL RESIDENTIAL LEASE OR RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP SERVED AUG-25-2017, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP SERVED AUG-25-2017, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF 351 TURK STREET PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DE LEON, JEREMY DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.